MD HB480 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1587

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle plugged into charging equipment in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; establishing certain standards for signage designating reserved parking for certain plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for purposes of complying with certain laws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws – Plug–In Electric Drive Vehicles – Reserved Parking Spaces

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {368073/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-23SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (111-21)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {300815/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-01-19HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

HB1587 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11145.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation211003.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback