MD HB477 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county or municipality to enact and enforce local laws regulating the sale and distribution of cigarettes, other tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices, subject to certain exceptions.
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB99 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-08 - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
HB1011 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
HB1011 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Business Regulation
Cigarettes
Commerce and Business
Counties
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Smoking and Vaping
Tobacco and Nicotine
Cigarettes
Commerce and Business
Counties
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Smoking and Vaping
Tobacco and Nicotine
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 16 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |