MD HB476 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Education to authorize a teacher certificated in secondary education to provide instruction in the teacher's content area to students in grades 6 through 12; and requiring the State Board to adopt certain regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Certification in Secondary Education Content Areas - Expanded Grade Range

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-04SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education6124(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback