MD HB470 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools to report certain information on revenues and spending to the Maryland Higher Education Commission on or before June 30 each year; annually requiring that, on or after July 1, 2022, in order to maintain approval to operate in the State and enroll certain students, the institutions and schools must submit a certain plan and provide certain refunds under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
For-Profit Institutions of Higher Education and Private Career Schools - Instructional Spending - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Subjects
Certifications
Education
Electronic Communication
Exemptions
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Private Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time
Tuition
Education
Electronic Communication
Exemptions
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Private Schools
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time
Tuition