MD HB465 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the State Superintendent of Schools be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate; and prohibiting the appointment of an individual as State Superintendent if the individual is, or during the immediately preceding year was, a member of the State Board of Education.
Title
State Superintendent of Schools - Qualifications and Senate Confirmation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2021-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Education, State Board of
Emergency Bills
General Assembly
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Teachers
Time
Emergency Bills
General Assembly
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
School Administration
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 2 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |