MD HB465 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition against operating golf carts on highways that are designated or maintained as a part of the State or federal highway system in the City of Crisfield in Somerset County; repealing the authority of the State Highway Administration to designate a location for golf carts to cross highways in the City of Crisfield that are designated or maintained as a part of the State or federal highway system; and lowering the maximum speed limit for a highway on which a person may operate a golf cart in the City of Crisfield.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {970714/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road