MD HB465 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a carrier that issues or delivers a health benefit plan in the State from charging a premium or changing a premium before the applicable premium rate or premium rate change is filed with and approved by the Insurance Commissioner; requiring any applicable premium rate or premium rate change to be filed with the Commissioner in accordance with specified provisions of law and regulations applicable to specified carriers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plan Premium Rate Review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-30 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2012-03-27 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-27 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-02 Favorable Report by Finance
2012-03-27 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-22 First Reading Finance
2012-04-01 Returned Passed
2012-03-20 Third Reading Passed (135-0)
2012-03-18 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-18 Favorable with Amendments 416386/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-20 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2012-02-08 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-02 First Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback