MD HB464 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a marketplace license in a certain geographic area in the 41st legislative district in Baltimore City; and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue the license.
Title
Baltimore City - 41st Legislative District - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 753 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1001.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |