MD HB464 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending until December 31, 2015, a credit against the State income tax for electricity produced by qualified Maryland facilities from qualified energy resources; extending until December 31, 2015, the time period in which the Maryland Energy Administration may issue specified credit certificates; altering requirements for credit certificates; prohibiting the Administration from issuing initial credit certificates for less than a specified amount; providing for the refund of the credit under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Special Order next session (Delegate Hixson) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Ways and Means & Economic Matters |