MD HB462 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1060

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health to provide the address of a residential rehabilitation program to certain entities at least 14 days before issuing a certain license; requiring the administrative head of a residential rehabilitation program to report a certain critical incident to certain entities 24 hours after receiving certain notification; requiring a certain local behavioral health authority to conduct a certain assessment and evaluation within 14 days after receiving a certain report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Rehabilitation Programs - Reporting of Critical Incidents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-02-08HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

HB1060 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General10714(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback