MD HB461 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to determine whether a reportable incident constitutes private inurement if a private nonprofit institution of higher education engages in a reportable incident; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Higher Education Commission - Private Nonprofit Institutions of Higher Education - Regulation (Private Nonprofit Institution of Higher Education Protection Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback