MD HB461 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim or victim's family member to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification; providing that, for the purpose of the Act, a victim shall be considered to be helpful, to have been helpful, or likely to be helpful to the detection, investigation, or prosecution of a qualifying criminal activity; requiring the certifying official to sign and complete the certification in a specified manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-3) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-47) (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {528879/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-21SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (89-47)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-19HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback