MD HB460 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Human Services to post on its website a free online course on the identification, prevention, and reporting of child abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Human Services - Child Abuse Prevention - Online Course

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-24HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law5716(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback