MD HB458 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the School Safety Grant Program and the Aging Schools Program as of June 30, 2026; altering provisions relating to school construction approvals by the State Superintendent of Schools; altering provisions related to a public-private partnership agreement in Prince George's County; establishing that the Interagency Commission on School Construction is an independent unit of State government; repealing the requirement for the Board of Public Works to approve grants awarded under a certain capital grant program; etc.
Title
Public School Construction - Programs, Approvals, and Administration - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:15 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433125/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB360 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
General Assembly
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
General Assembly
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |