MD HB455 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authority of the Ocean Downs Race Course to use certain Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery terminal proceeds for operating loss assistance to support a certain minimum number of live racing days at the racecourse.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Purse Dedication Account - Ocean Downs Race Course Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsors
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] |
Del. Wayne Hartman [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642 |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |