MD HB444 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Prince George's County planning board to include nontraditional recreational opportunities in their program of recreation; establishing the Nontraditional Recreation Fund; requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to record certain revenues in the Fund to be used for certain capital improvement projects, to provide patrons of the Commission with access to equipment for nontraditional recreational opportunities, and for supplies and direct program costs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County Planning Board - Nontraditional Recreational Opportunities - Establishment and Fund MC/PG 104-21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {740016/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-03-18HouseHearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
2021-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-12HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Land Use26201(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use26202(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use26203(n/a)See Bill Text
Land Use26204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback