MD HB440 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Police Commissioner of Baltimore City, following each decennial census of the United States, to prepare a plan for the adjustment of the geographic boundaries and composition of each Baltimore City police district and the reallocation of the resources and personnel of the Baltimore City Police Department among the districts using certain information; requiring the Commissioner to present the plan to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City within 1 year of the issuance of the decennial census data; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateHearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback