MD HB44 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB552
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the medical services provided by an emergency service transporter for which the Maryland Department of Health is required to reimburse the emergency service transporter that charges for its services and requests reimbursement from the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; and requiring the Department to increase the amount of reimbursement by $50 in fiscal year 2023 and pay at least that amount in each subsequent fiscal year.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923026/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 2:50 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
2021-10-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB552 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
SB295 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
SB295 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Subjects
Ambulances
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rescue Squads
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rescue Squads
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 114.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |