MD HB438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the appropriation in the annual budget for the purpose of providing grants to pay the capital costs of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to equal at least the amount appropriated in fiscal year 2026; requiring, subject to a certain contingency, that a certain mandated appropriation be increased by 3% each year; etc.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Funding Formulas - Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Metzgar) |
2022-04-01 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-01 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (34-12) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {823520/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Augustine) Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-35) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Arikan) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203626/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |