MD HB438 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; removing certain sources from the definition of a "Tier 1 renewable source"; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB560 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7701(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7704(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback