MD HB436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, an insurer that uses credit information to provide, on request, certain exceptions to the insurer's rates, ratings classifications, company or tier placement, or underwriting rules or guidelines to certain applicants and insureds whose credit information has been influenced by certain events; requiring an insurer, within 30 days after receipt of documentation of a certain event, to inform the applicant of the outcome of a request for a reasonable exception; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-40) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583827/1 Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Prices
Records
Revenue and Taxes