MD HB434 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing from 80% to 66 2/3% the percentage of unit owners listed on the current roster of a condominium needed to provide written consent to an amendment of a condominium's declaration if none of the units of the condominium are owned by a developer of the condominium.
Title
Maryland Condominium Act – Amendments to the Declaration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {393925/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB434 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |