MD HB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the owner of an economic development project and the governing body of Prince George's County to enter into multiple payment in lieu of taxes agreements for different phases of an economic development project; providing that the term of an agreement may not exceed 15 years from the date a certificate of occupancy is first issued for any phase of a project; requiring, by January 1 each year, that a report on certain projects be submitted to the Prince George's County Delegation in the General Assembly: etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Multiphase Economic Development Projects and Sunset Repeal PG 408-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 206 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795563/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Construction
Hotels and Motels
Mass Transit
Parking
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Construction
Hotels and Motels
Mass Transit
Parking
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Property - Local
Urban Renewal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Tax - Property | 7 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |