MD HB432 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer or a nonrefillable container permit for draft beer to a holder of a Class H beer and wine license if the licensed establishment is in Damascus.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Draft Beer for Off-Site Consumption in Damascus MC 12-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 1104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 25 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |