MD HB432 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's transit bus fleet that are not electric buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; requiring the report to include a plan for transitioning any adversely affected State employees to other employment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB423 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation7406(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback