MD HB431 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a homeowner's insurance claim; and prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a private passenger motor vehicle insurance claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateReferred Finance
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (100-39)
2020-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {753797/1 Adopted
2020-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB470 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance27501(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback