MD HB431 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding alternative financial investment bonds and create a certain model investment instrument for the State; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and General Assembly by January 1, 2020; etc.
Title
State Treasurer - Task Force to Study Alternative Financial Investment Bonds
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Bonds
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Investments
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Treasurers
Commercial Law - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Investments
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Treasurers