MD HB430 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget a certain appropriation from all fund sources for the Child Care Subsidy Program each fiscal year; requiring the Governor to appropriate funds from all fund sources in the State budget to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rates to a certain amount in certain fiscal years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-36) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (100-36)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {954262/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback