MD HB428 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB130
Note: Carry Over of previous HB369
Note: Carry Over of previous HB369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract includes a clause requiring the election service provider to report to the State Administrator of Elections if any stage in the manufacturing of a component of the provider's election system occurred outside the United States or if any material change to a component in any stage in the manufacturing of an election system occurred outside the United States; etc.
Title
Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 693721/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - Floor Amendment 693721/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Floor Amendment {693721/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (45-86) |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB428 (Carry Over) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB369 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
HB369 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Subjects
Ballots
Contracts
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Equipment
Foreign Trade
Industry and Technology
internet
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Reports
Voting
Contracts
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Equipment
Foreign Trade
Industry and Technology
internet
Interstate Affairs
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Reports
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |