MD HB427 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to adopt a certain written policy to authorize a student to possess and use sunscreen on school property or at a school-sponsored activity without written permission from a health care provider; and requiring each county board to encourage public schools to educate students about sunscreen, sun safety, and the policy established under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-22HouseFloor Amendment {493722/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
2018-02-22HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {465162/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0427&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0427f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0427t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_33_hb0427t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0427_46516201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0427_49372201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0427.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0427_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0159.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0427_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1016.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback