MD HB420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the Health Services Cost Review Commission exercise its authority to consider certain standards when determining the reasonableness of certain rates in a manner that is consistent with the all-payer model contract.
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsors
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Brian Chisholm [R] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] |
Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Subjects
Contracts
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Prices
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Prices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |