MD HB42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the county commissioners or county council to approve a certain referendum request if a valid petition to incorporate a certain area as a municipality is presented by not less than 40% of the registered voters who are residents of the area proposed to be incorporated.
Title
Municipal Incorporation – County Commissioners or County Council – Required Consideration of Referendum Request
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-07-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1226 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
County Commissioners
County Councils
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Petitions
Referendum
Residency
County Councils
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Petitions
Referendum
Residency
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 4 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0042?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0042f.pdf |