MD HB416 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health adopt certain regulations that establish specific standards governing memory care and Alzheimer's disease units in assisted living programs, including certain training requirements, certain staffing pattern requirements, certain activity requirements, certain admissions and discharge criteria, and certain other procedures, and that require compliance by assisted living programs with the standards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-20HouseHearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-23HouseHearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-10-23HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB204 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General191805(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback