MD HB414 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments owed to the cooperative housing corporation; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to give certain notice of a member's right to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {600612/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback