MD HB41 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland State Bank Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to review and evaluate, in a certain manner, the creation of a Maryland State Bank that would support economic development in the State, provide stability to the local financial sector, and reduce some costs paid by the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland State Bank Task Force - Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-29HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-29HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback