MD HB407 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an individual from engaging in the business of inspecting an on-site sewage disposal system unless the person holds a valid on-site wastewater property transfer inspection license issued by the Department of the Environment on or after July 1, 2022; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations by January 1, 2022; providing an administrative penalty of up to $10,000 for a violation of the Act; providing that each inspection knowingly conducted without a valid license constitutes a separate violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Inspection - Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444
2021-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (112-26)
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (37-10)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFloor Amendment {463027/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-01SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-19SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-18HouseThird Reading Passed (103-29)
2021-02-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {610718/1 Adopted
2021-02-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-08-25HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB22 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment9217.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9217.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0407?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0407f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0407t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0407e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_444_hb0407e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0407_61071801.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0407_46302701.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0407_ent.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0407_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0148.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0915.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1208.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback