MD HB406 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that the application fee for a structural shoreline stabilization project located on or adjacent to a State-owned lake may not exceed $250; and requiring the Department of the Environment, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources, to identify up to three types of structural stabilization practices that may be implemented on or adjacent to a State-owned lake.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-7) (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (131-7)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {260614/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback