MD HB404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Commerce in a certain annual report on economic development programs to include information for minority business enterprises on the number of enterprises that received assistance from each economic development program and the percentage of assistance distributed to each minority business enterprise from each economic development program compared to the total assistance distributed from each economic development program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred Finance
2020-02-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-02-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-14HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB499 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Referred Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development5109(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14301(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback