MD HB403 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Community College Facilities Renewal Grant Program to provide State funds to community colleges for improvements, repairs, and deferred maintenance projects; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program; requiring the Governor to annually appropriate a certain amount in a certain budget to the Commission; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to the appropriation for a certain other program; establishing requirements and limitations in awarding grants; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687
2018-03-28HousePassed Enrolled
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {809237/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0403&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0403f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0403t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0403e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_687_hb0403e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0403_80923701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0403.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0403_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0359.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0403_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0819.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0912.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback