MD HB401 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a model policy to support the educational and parenting goals and improve the educational outcomes of pregnant and parenting students; requiring the model policy to include certain policies and procedures; requiring each county board of education to establish a policy based on the Department's model policy; and altering the required contents of the pregnant and parenting students attendance policy developed by each county board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-04HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-27HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB438 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education4138(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7301.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback