MD HB400 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State, a county, or a bicounty agency to provide to a municipality certain notification at least 24 hours before the State, county, or bicounty agency sprays a pesticide to control mosquitos within the municipality; and providing a certain exception that if the State, county, or bicounty agency determines there is a certain public health threat which necessitates spraying, notification may be made as soon as practicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {970411/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback