MD HB399 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-06 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the State from purchasing a gasoline-powered leaf blower beginning July 1, 2023; and prohibiting the State from using a gasoline-powered leaf blower beginning July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gasoline-Powered Leaf Blowers - State Purchase and Use - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment3601(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback