MD HB399 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making certain requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a certain request to be made in a certain manner; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet certain requirements; establishing certain requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a certain form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (74-66) (Y: 75 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (74-66)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-04HouseSpecial Order until 03/06 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {816189/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-15HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-01-31HouseHearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback