MD HB396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Montgomery County Planning Board to stream live video or teleconference audio or other audio of the open meetings of the Board and to prepare minutes of each open meeting; requiring the Board to maintain on its website complete and unedited archived recordings of livestreamed open meetings and the minutes of its open meetings; and providing that the inability of the Board to comply with the livestreaming requirements due to technical issues does not affect the validity of actions taken by the Board at an open meeting.
Title
Montgomery County Planning Board - Open Meetings - Video and Audio Streaming and Minutes PG/MC 101-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456 |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Montgomery County
Open Government
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Video
Zoning and Planning
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Montgomery County
Open Government
Recordings
Records
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Video
Zoning and Planning