MD HB396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB392
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, by January 1, 2021, to establish guidelines for early childhood developmental screenings for children under the age of 3 years to be used by child care centers for certain purposes; requiring, beginning, July 1, 2021, certain child care centers to offer evaluations for children entering these centers; requiring an employee of each center to provide information to parents and guardians about the Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program and provide assistance in contacting a certain agency; etc.
Title
Child Care Centers – Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsors
Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Alice Cain [D] | Del. Catherine Forbes [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Del. Ken Kerr [D] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {415666/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Age
Child Care
Children
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Child Care
Children
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Education, State Department of
Job Training
Licenses
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education