MD HB395 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that funds in a certain renewable and clean energy programs account be used for the Maryland Healthy Soils Program; and requiring that $500,000 of the renewable and clean energy programs account be allocated to the Maryland Healthy Soils Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {673890/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-24HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment21002(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government920B-05(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback