MD HB395 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2017, on methodologies to set child care subsidy reimbursement rates in the Child Care Subsidy Program; and requiring the report to contain specified information.
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Child Care
Children
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
General Assembly
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Children
Committees and Commissions
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
General Assembly
Reimbursement Rates
Reports