MD HB392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for certain calendar years the authorization to use certain Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery proceeds for operating loss assistance by the Ocean Downs Race Course and Rosecroft Raceway to support a minimum of 40 annual live racing days at each race course.
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |