MD HB392 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer that issues a motor vehicle liability insurance policy that contains personal injury protection coverage from increasing the premium on the policy due to a claim or payment made under that coverage; defining "increase the premium" to include an increase in total premium for a policy due to a surcharge, retiering or other reclassification of the policy, or removal or reduction of a discount; altering a specified notice requirement; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection Coverage - Prohibition on Premium Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |