MD HB392 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, in consultation with the Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General, to conduct a study of the State's debt settlement services industry; requiring the Office, in consultation with the Division, to establish a workgroup comprising specified representatives; requiring the Office, in consultation with the Division, to report findings to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Study
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. William Bronrott [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Del. Sue Hecht [D] | Del. Henry Heller [D] | Del. Michael Vaughn [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-10 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-10 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pugh) Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (133-4) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Unfair Trade Practices
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Unfair Trade Practices